Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10538539 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2020 | B2 | US2019023727 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR00449 | 13.01.2017 | KR20160005957 | 18.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6584696B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | B2 | JP2019503400 | 07.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR00449 | 13.01.2017 | KR20160005957 | 18.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108473454B | Global Dossier | 25.03.2022 | B | CN108473454 | 31.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR00449 | 13.01.2017 | KR20160005957 | 18.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3406604 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | B1 | EP3406604 | 05.06.2019 | A4 | EP3406604 | 28.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017KR00449 | 13.01.2017 | KR20160005957 | 18.01.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017126847 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160005957 | 18.01.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101777634B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B1 | KR20170086291 | 26.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160005957 | 18.01.2016 |