EP3405053 - TEMPERATURE REGULATING GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverberg, Mark 15 Parkway North Boulevard, Apt. 211 Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | IPAZ 10 boulevard Victor Hugo 34000 Montpellier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | IPAZ 18 rue de la République 34000 Montpellier / FR | Application number, filing date | 17741785.4 | 13.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017US13295 | Priority number, date | US201615004654 | 22.01.2016 Original published format: US201615004654 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017127290 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405053 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/005, A41D13/12, A41D27/20, A41D27/04 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A41D13/005 (EP);
A41D13/1209 (EP);
A41D27/04 (EP);
A41D27/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/48] | A41D13/005 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURREGELNDES KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK | [2018/48] | English: | TEMPERATURE REGULATING GARMENT | [2018/48] | French: | VÊTEMENT À RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 06.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US2015026862 (SILVERBERG MARK [US]) [X] 1-19 * , entire document, especially fig. 8-10, 12; para [0032]; para [0040]; para [0055-0058]; para [0060-0062]; para [0066]; para [0071-0072] * [Y] 20; | [Y]US2007057003 (KEYES IVORY [US]) [Y] 20 * , entire document, especially fig. 1A-1B; para [0022-0023] *; | [XY]US2403676 (MICHAEL MODLINSKI) [X] 1-4, 10 * , entire document * [Y] 5-9, 11-20; | [XY]CN104473338 (ZHEJIANG YINGBAO CLOTHING CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 10-11, 15-16 * , entire document * [Y] 3-9, 12-14, 17-20; | [A]CA2797436 (ROTHSCHILD MICHAEL B [GB]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2015359279 (CHANG TENG-YAO [TW]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US4696066 (BALL JOYCE A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2004172734 (HARTBRODT RICK J [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2008093354 (FANG JIM [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * |