EP3405101 - DIFFERENTIAL DIAGNOSIS OF ECTOPIC CUSHING'S SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corcept Therapeutics, Inc. 149 Commonwealth Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORAITIS, Andreas G. 149 Commonwealth Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/48] | 01 /
MORAITIS, Andreas G. 149 Commonwealth Drive Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17741860.5 | 18.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017US13974 | Priority number, date | US201662280424P | 19.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662280424 P | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017127448 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405101 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3405101 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N33/74 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/743 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B5/4227 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P5/38 (EP,IL);
G01N33/74 (IL,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,IL,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,IL,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,IL,US);
G01N2333/575 (EP,IL,US);
G01N2333/723 (EP,IL,US);
G01N2800/04 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIALDIAGNOSE VON EKTOPISCHEM CUSHING-SYNDROM | [2018/48] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL DIAGNOSIS OF ECTOPIC CUSHING'S SYNDROME | [2018/48] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC DIFFÉRENTIEL DU SYNDROME DE CUSHING ECTOPIQUE | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2017 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | IE | 18.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.01.2017 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.01.2017 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 18.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Tsigos ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL DIAGNOSIS AND MANAGEMENT OF CUSHING'S SYNDROME 1", Annual Review of Medicine, 4139 El Camino Way, P.O. Box 10139, doi:10.1146/annurev.med.47.1.443, (19960201), pages 443 - 461, URL: http://annualreviews.org/doi/pdf/10.1146/annurev.med.47.1.443, XP055364773 [A] 1-15 * page 447 - page 455 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.med.47.1.443 | [A] - DIEZ JUAN J ET AL, "Pharmacological therapy of Cushing 's syndrome: drugs and indications", MINI REVIEWS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBL, NL, (20070101), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.2174/138955707780619653, ISSN 1389-5575, pages 467 - 480, XP009120098 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 474 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138955707780619653 | [A] - RAFF HERSHEL AURORA, "Cushing Syndrome Update on Testing", ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, PHILADELPHIA, vol. 44, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ECL.2014.10.005, ISSN 0889-8529, (20150228), pages 43 - 50, X, (20141104), XP009513627 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ecl.2014.10.005 | International search | [A]US2004138516 (OSORIO IVAN [US], et al) [A] 9-24* See abstract; claims 25-30. *; | [A]US2014170768 (EHRENKRANZ JOEL R L [US]) [A] 9-24 * See abstract; claims 1-10. *; | [A] - RITZEL, K. et al., "ACTH after 15 min distinguishes between Cushing's disease and ectopic Cushing's syndrome: a proposal for a short and simple CRH test", European Journal of Endocrinology, (20150000), vol. 173, no. 2, pages 197 - 204, XP055402544 [A] 9-24 * See abstract; pages 198 and 199. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/EJE-14-0912 | [A] - REIMONDO, G. et al., "The corticotrophin-releasing hormone test is the most reliable noninvasive method to differentiate pituitary from ectopic ACTH secretion in Cushing' s syndrome", Clinical Endocrinology, (20030000), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 718 - 724, XP055402548 [A] 9-24 * See summary; pages 719-721. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2265.2003.01776.x | [A] - EL-SHAFIE, 0. T. et al., "Adrenocorticotropic hormone-dependent Cushing's syndrome: use of an octreotide trial to distinguish between pituitary or ectopic sources", Sultan Qaboos University Medical Journal, (20150121), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 120 - 123, XP055402551 [A] 9-24 * See abstract; page e122. * | by applicant | US4296206 | US4386085 | US4447424 | US4477445 | US4519946 | US4540686 | US4547493 | US4634695 | US4634696 | US4753932 | US4774236 | US4808710 | US4814327 | US4829060 | US4861763 | US4912097 | US4921638 | US4943566 | US4954490 | US4978657 | US5006518 | US5043332 | US5064822 | US5073548 | US5089488 | US5089635 | US5093507 | US5095010 | US5095129 | US5132299 | US5166146 | US5166199 | US5173405 | US5276023 | US5348729 | US5380839 | US5426102 | US5439913 | WO9619458 | US5616458 | EP0683172 | US5696127 | US5929058 | EP0763541 | US6051573 | US6303591 | US2002077356 | US6570020 | WO03043640 | US7928237 | US8461172 | US2014038926 | US8685973 | - "Biosynthesis and Transport of Membrane Lipids and Formation of Cholesterol Derivatives", RAWN et al., Biochemistry, (19890000), page 567 | - TURNERMULLER, J Mol. Endocrinol., (20050000), vol. 35, pages 283 - 292 | - LEFEBVRE, J. Steroid Biochem., (19890000), vol. 33, pages 557 - 563 | - FLESERIU et al., J. Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (20120609), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 2039 - 49 | - ASSER et al., Mol Cell Endocrinol., (20140000), vol. 395, pages 1 - 9 | - ALBERTSON et al., Eur. J. of Endocrinol., (19940000), vol. 130, pages 195 - 200 | - ASSER et al., Mol. Cell. Endocrino., (20140900), vol. 395, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 9 | - VAN KAMPEN et al., Eur. J. Pharmacol., (20020000), vol. 457, no. 2-3, page 207 | - HOYBERG et al., Int'l J. of Neuro-psychopharmacology, (20020000), vol. 5, no. 1, page S148 | - AGARWAL, FEBS, (19870000), vol. 217, pages 221 - 226 | - BOCQUEL, J. Steroid Biochem. Molec. Biol., (19930000), vol. 45, pages 205 - 215 | - TEUTSCH, Steroids, (19810000), vol. 38, pages 651 - 665 | - MERCIER, J. Steroid Biochem., (19860000), vol. 25, no. 11-20, pages 25 - 32 | - ROUSSEAU, Nature, (19790000), vol. 279, pages 158 - 160 | - WYNNE, Endocrinology, (19800000), vol. 107, pages 1278 - 1280 | - VICENT, Mol. Pharm., (19970000), vol. 52, pages 749 - 753 | - MIZUTANI, J Steroid Biochem Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 42, no. 7, pages 695 - 704 | - KIM, J Steroid Biochem Mol. Biol., (19980000), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 213 - 22 | - AMOUR, Int. J. Pept. Protein Res., (19940000), vol. 43, pages 297 - 304 | - DE BONT, Bioorganic & Medicinal Chem., (19960000), vol. 4, pages 667 - 672 | - BRADLEY et al., J. Med. Chem., (20020000), vol. 45, pages 2417 - 2424 | - ROHATAGI, J. Clin. Pharmacol., (19950000), vol. 35, pages 1187 - 1193 | - TJWA, Ann. Allergy Asthma Immunol., (19950000), vol. 75, pages 107 - 111 | - MINTO, J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (19970000), vol. 281, pages 93 - 102 | - RAO, J. Biomater Sci. Polym. Ed., (19950000), vol. 7, pages 623 - 645 | - GAO, Pharm. Res., (19950000), vol. 12, pages 857 - 863 | - EYLES, J. Pharm. Pharmacol., (19970000), vol. 49, pages 669 - 674 | - AL-MUHAMMED, J., Microencapsul., (19960000), vol. 13, pages 293 - 306 | - CHONN, Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19950000), vol. 6, pages 698 - 708 | - OSTRO, Am. J. Hasp. Pharm., (19890000), vol. 46, pages 1576 - 1587 |