EP3484853 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POLYMORPHIC FORM OF 3-[5-AMINO-4-(3-CYANOBENZOYL)-PYRAZOL-1-YL]-N-CYCLOPROPYL-4-METHYLBENZAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mereo BioPharma 1 Limited 1 Cavendish Place London, Greater London W1G 0QF / GB | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULEIMAN, Osama Johnson Matthey Plc. Fine Chemicals Division (Pharmorphix) 250 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WE / GB | 02 /
PEREZ, Lucia Romero Johnson Matthey Plc. Johnson Matthey Chemical Product Orchard Road Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | 03 /
HARLACHER, Cornelius Stephan Zihlackerstrasse 60 4153 Reinach / CH | 04 /
JONES, Stewart Mereo Biopharma Group plc 4th Floor 1 Cavendish Place London Greater London W1G 0QF / GB | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17742277.1 | 13.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017GB52055 | Priority number, date | GB20160012238 | 14.07.2016 Original published format: GB 201612238 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011578 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484853 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3484853 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3484853 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/38, A61K31/415, A61P29/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
C07D231/38 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLYMORPHEN FORM VON 3-[5-AMINO-4-(3-CYANOBENZOYL)-PYRAZOL-1-YL]-N-CYCLOPROPYL-4-METHYLBENZAMID | [2019/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POLYMORPHIC FORM OF 3-[5-AMINO-4-(3-CYANOBENZOYL)-PYRAZOL-1-YL]-N-CYCLOPROPYL-4-METHYLBENZAMIDE | [2019/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FORME POLYMORPHE DE 3- [5-AMINO-4-(3-CYANOBENZOYL)-PYRAZOL-1-YL]-N-CYCLOPROPYL-4-MÉTHYLBENZAMIDE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 12.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | EE | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 21.04.2021 | |
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 21.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005009973 (TRIAD THERAPEUCTICS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2005009973 |