EP3500969 - RECONFIGURED VIRTUAL MACHINE TO MITIGATE ATTACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL-MOUSSA, Fadi Ground Floor Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | 02 /
HERWONO, Ian Ground Floor Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17743039.4 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017EP68738 | Priority number, date | EP20160184383 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: EP 16184383 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018033350 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500969 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F9/455 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G06F21/577 (EP,US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/047 (US);
H04L63/1433 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | REKONFIGURIERTE VIRTUELLE MASCHINE ZUM ABSCHWÄCHEN VON ANGRIFFEN | [2019/26] | English: | RECONFIGURED VIRTUAL MACHINE TO MITIGATE ATTACK | [2019/26] | French: | MACHINE VIRTUELLE RECONFIGURÉE POUR RÉDUIRE LE RISQUE D'ATTAQUE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 23.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010175108 (PROTAS ANDRE [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0052] - [0064] *; | [Y]US2014173740 (ALBANESE MASSIMILIANO [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] ** paragraphs [0018] - [0033] *; | [Y]US2016021122 (PEVNY TOMAS [CZ]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0080] - [0086] * * paragraph [0127] * * paragraphs [0137] - [0145] * * paragraphs [0155] - [0180] *; | [Y] - FISCHER ASJA ET AL, "Training restricted Boltzmann machines: An introduction", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (20130607), vol. 47, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2013.05.025, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 25 - 39, XP028730382 [Y] 1-11 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2013.05.025 |