Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
13.07.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.11.2019 | Change - representative | |
20.09.2019 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
20.09.2019 | Change - extension states | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.07.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.04.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
19.04.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.04.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
26.03.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2019 | Change - representative | |
25.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.02.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.01.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.08.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication |