Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018014717 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 | US201715647796 | 12.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190028496 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 | WO2017US41674 | 12.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019522545 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 | WO2017US41674 | 12.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109688893 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 | WO2017US41674 | 12.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017296328 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 | WO2017US41674 | 12.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3484339 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 | WO2017US41674 | 12.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018013660 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662361816 | 13.07.2016 |