EP3541858 - POLYMERIZATION PROCESSES UTILIZING CHROMIUM-CONTAINING CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [2022/45] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Zerong 3314 Lockridge Harbor Lane Porter, TX 77365 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Edward F. 3231 Allen Parkway 6103 Houston, TX 77019 / US | 03 /
TRAPP, Keith W. 2503 Red Wren Ct. Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | [2019/41] |
Former [2019/39] | 01 /
LIN, Zerong 1215 Eversham Way Kingwood, TX 77339 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Edward F. 3231 Allen Parkway 6103 Houston, TX 77019 / US | |||
03 /
TRAPP, Keith W. 2503 Red Wren Ct. Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2019/39] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17743413.1 | 19.06.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US38127 | Priority number, date | US201662423943P | 18.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662423943 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093421 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541858 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3541858 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/24, C08F4/69 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/38 (KR,US);
C08F4/025 (KR,US);
C08F4/24 (KR,US);
C08F4/52 (KR);
C08F4/615 (US);
C08F4/69 (KR,US);
C08F2500/04 (KR);
C08F2500/07 (KR);
C08F2500/12 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/12 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/24 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/69 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERUNGSVERFAHREN MIT VERWENDUNG VON CHROMHALTIGEN KATALYSATOREN | [2019/39] | English: | POLYMERIZATION PROCESSES UTILIZING CHROMIUM-CONTAINING CATALYSTS | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE POLYMÉRISATION UTILISANT DES CATALYSEURS CONTENANT DU CHROME | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 13.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | ES | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | IT | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | NL | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | GB | 19.06.2023 | IE | 19.06.2023 | LU | 19.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
GB | 19.06.2023 | ||
IE | 19.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
IE | 19.06.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 19.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US3158594 (MICHEL WEIL ROGER, et al) [I] 1-25 * column 2, line 25 - line 60 * * column 4, line 26 - line 62 * * column 5, line 4 - line 8 *; | [I]WO0202652 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-25 * page 1, line 23 - line 37 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 13 *; | [I]US2012058288 (KUZUBA YUUICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-25* paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0173] * | by applicant | US2825721 | US3887494 | US4543399 | US4588790 | US5028670 | US5096868 | US5317036 | US5352749 | US5405922 | US5436304 | US5453471 | US5462999 | US5616661 | US5668228 | US6174981 | US2003232935 | US6833417 | US6841630 | US6989344 | US7202313 | US7504463 | US7563851 | US2011010938 | US7915357 | WO2011161412 | US8101691 | US8129484 | US8420754 | WO2016036745 | - CARRAHER, JR.; CHARLES E., POLYMER CHEMISTRY: AN INTRODUCTION, Marcel Dekker Inc., (19960000), pages 512 - 516 |