EP3409705 - COMPOSITION FOR POLYURETHANE FOAM CONTAINING POLYROTAXANE, POLYURETHANE FOAM DERIVED FROM COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM Inc. 6-2-3, Kashiwanoha Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-0882 / JP | [2022/02] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states Advanced Softmaterials Inc. 5-4-6 Kashiwanoha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Yuki c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 5-4-6 Kashiwanoha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 02 /
TAKAOKA, Masanobu c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 5-4-6 Kashiwanoha Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0882 / JP | 03 /
KOMATSUZAKI, Masamichi c/o YUKIGAYA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. TSUKUBA FACTORY 4663-1 Shimoohta Inashiki-shi Ibaraki 300-1424 / JP | 04 /
WONGNAK, Rawiwan c/o YUKIGAYA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. TSUKUBA FACTORY 4663-1 Shimoohta Inashiki-shi Ibaraki 300-1424 / JP | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17744228.2 | 25.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017JP02444 | Priority number, date | JP20160012671 | 26.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016012671 | [2018/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017130998 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3409705 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3409705 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3409705 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/64, C08G18/00, C08G18/40, C08G101/00, C08G18/48, C08G18/76, C08G18/12, C08G18/24, C08G18/32 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
C08G18/4825 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (US);
A45D33/00 (US);
A45D34/04 (US);
A45D40/26 (US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/248 (EP,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/4812 (EP,US);
C08G18/4829 (EP,US);
C08G18/6484 (EP,US);
C08G18/7642 (EP,US);
C08J9/125 (US);
C08L75/08 (US);
A45D2200/1009 (US);
C08J2203/10 (US);
C08J2375/08 (US);
C08J2487/00 (US);
C08L2203/14 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3206 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | C08G18/64, C08G18/00, C08G18/40, C08G101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINEN POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF MIT POLYROTAXAN POLYURETHANSCHAUM AUS DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF | [2018/49] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR POLYURETHANE FOAM CONTAINING POLYROTAXANE, POLYURETHANE FOAM DERIVED FROM COMPOSITION, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE FOAM | [2018/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINÉE À UNE MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANE COMPRENANT DU POLYROTAXANE, MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANNE DÉRIVÉE DE LA COMPOSITION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANNE | [2018/49] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2018 | Translation filed | 06.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 03.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2017 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | TR | 22.12.2021 | IE | 25.01.2022 | LU | 25.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | FR | 22.02.2022 | BG | 22.03.2022 | GB | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 25.01.2022 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 25.01.2022 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 25.01.2022 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 25.01.2022 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 25.01.2022 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 25.01.2022 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 22.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2013091696 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,3; compound (A) at the bottom of page 6 *[A] 7-13 | International search | [Y]WO2005047360 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0001], [0001], [0002], [0031], [0037] & US 2006/0247325 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0002], [0003], [0038]; table 1 & EP 1688449 A1 & KR 10-2006-0118544 A & CN 1878813 A *; | [Y]JP2011241401 (ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC) [Y] 1-13 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0009], [0041], [0105] & WO 2012/165402 A1 *; | [Y]WO2013099842 (ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0044], [0107], [0108] & CN 104024278 A *; | [Y]WO2015174187 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-13* , claim 1; paragraphs [0013], [0140] (Family: none) * |