|
20.12.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
15.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
15.02.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
15.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
40 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |