EP3510648 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BATTERY MODULES HAVING TERMINAL BLOCK ASSEMBLIES WITH DRAINAGE CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPS Technology Holdings LLC 250 Vesey Street 15th Floor New York, New York 10281 / US | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEKEUSTER, Richard M. 5705 Randal Lane Racine, Wisconsin 53402 / US | 02 /
MACK, Robert J. 1812 E. Lafayette Pl Apt. 308 Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | 03 /
DINKELMAN, John P. 1727 Monroe Avenue South Wilwaukee, Wisconsin 53172 / US | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/29] | 01 /
DEKEUSTER, Richard M. 5705 Randal Lane Racine, Wisconsin 53402 / US | ||
02 /
MACK, Robert J. 314 W. Vine Street Unit 6 Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53212 / US | |||
03 /
DINKELMAN, John P. 1727 Monroe Avenue South Wilwaukee, Wisconsin 53172 / US | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17746286.8 | 19.07.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017US42913 | Priority number, date | US201615263065 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: US201615263065 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018048509 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3510648 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3510648 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/502, H01M50/543, H01M50/20, H01M50/116, H01M10/625, H01M10/058, H01M10/052 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/571 (US);
B29C65/16 (US);
B29C70/88 (US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/058 (EP,US);
H01M10/06 (US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/227 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,US);
H01M50/507 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (US);
B29K2105/06 (US);
B29L2031/3468 (US);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M2/30, H01M10/052, H01M10/058, H01M10/625, H01M2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR BATTERIEMODULE MIT WASSERABFÜHRUNGSKANÄLEN | [2022/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BATTERY MODULES HAVING TERMINAL BLOCK ASSEMBLIES WITH DRAINAGE CHANNELS | [2019/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MODULES DE BATTERIE AVEC DÉCHARGE D'EAU | [2022/12] |
Former [2019/29] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR BATTERIEMODULE MIT ANSCHLUSSLEISTENANORDNUNGEN MIT ENTWÄSSERUNGSKANÄLEN | ||
Former [2019/29] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MODULES DE BATTERIE AYANT DES ASSEMBLAGES BORNIER DOTÉS DE CANAUX DE DRAINAGE | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 11.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | DK | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | IT | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5941719 (HAYAKAWA TATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004214458 (MAEBASHI AKEMI [JP]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010173190 (TSUCHIYA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2012045667 (YONEDA HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2013234511 (MURATA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,8-10,12,21-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0031]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0039]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0033]; figures 2-3 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 4-7 [I] 2,3,11,13-20,25; | [YA]US2016197328 (MACK ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 4-7 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056]; figures 3-7; claim 24 * * figure 6 * [A] 1-3,8-25; | [A]US2016197320 (MACK ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |