EP3412649 - TERPINEOL AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Academy Of Traditional Chinese Medicine No.132 Tianmu Mount Road Xihu District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310007 / CN | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Wanping No.132 Tianmu Mount Road Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310007 / CN | 02 /
HU, Yongzhou No.132 Tianmu Mount Road Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310007 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xia No.132 Tianmu Mount Road Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310007 / CN | 04 /
KONG, Fanzhi No.132 Tianmu Mount Road Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310007 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Yuji No.132 Tianmu Mount Road Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310007 / CN | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias Karo IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Rössler, Matthias Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels Patentanwälte PartG mbB (Karo IP Professionals) Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17746749.5 | 16.01.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017CN71217 | Priority number, date | CN20161079970 | 04.02.2016 Original published format: CN201610079970 | [2018/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017133429 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412649 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3412649 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/14, C07C69/24, C07C29/17, C07C31/135, C07C229/12, C07D295/15, C07C291/02, C07D211/74, A61K31/045, A61K31/22, A61K31/5375, A61K31/4453, A61K31/45, A61P11/06 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/045 (EP);
C07C67/14 (EP,CN);
C07D221/00 (US);
A61K31/22 (EP);
A61K31/45 (EP);
A61K31/5375 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P9/12 (US);
C07C203/04 (US);
C07C227/02 (CN);
C07C229/12 (EP,US);
C07C29/17 (EP);
C07C29/172 (CN);
C07C291/02 (EP);
C07C31/135 (EP);
C07C319/20 (CN);
C07C323/52 (US);
C07C69/24 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/02, C07C229/12 (CN);
C07C29/172, C07C31/1355 (CN);
C07C319/20, C07C323/52 (CN);
C07C67/14, C07C69/24 (CN); |
Former IPC [2018/50] | C07C67/14, C07C69/24, C07C29/17, C07C31/135, C07C229/12, C07D295/15, C07C291/02, C07D211/74, A61K31/045, A61K31/22, A61K31/5375 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TERPINEOL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/50] | English: | TERPINEOL AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2018/50] | French: | TERPINÉOL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET APPLICATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2018 | Translation filed | 24.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 01.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2017 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MK | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.01.2017 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]CN102416154 (KEYUAN WANG) [X] 1, 6, 7, 9 * description, paragraph [0009] *; | [X]WO2013034416 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 8 * claims 1-15 *; | [X]CN103922927 (ZHEJIANG ACADEMY OF TRADITIONAL CHINESE MEDICINE) [X] 1-7, 9 * claims 1-8, and description, paragraphs [0003]-[0005], embodiments 7-9 *; | [X] - BIAN, RULIAN et al., "THE PHARMACOLOGICAL PROPERTIES OF A NEW ANTIASTHMATIC DRUG, a-TERPINEOL", Chinese Pharmacological Bulletin, (19871231), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 1001-1978, page 323 and 326, XP009507861 [X] 1, 6, 7, 9 |