EP3413528 - TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Takashi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
OUCHI, Wataru c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
AIBA, Tatsushi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2019/08] |
Former [2018/50] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Takashi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-Citry, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
OUCHI, Wataru c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | |||
03 /
AIBA, Tatsushi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17747467.3 | 01.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017JP03630 | Priority number, date | JP20160019537 | 04.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016019537 | [2018/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017135312 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413528 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3413528 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04J1/00, H04L27/01, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
H04L5/0092 (EP,US);
H04L27/2666 (KR,US);
H04J1/00 (EP,US);
H04L27/01 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (US);
H04L5/0046 (US);
H04L5/0053 (KR);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/20 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | H04L27/26, H04J1/00, H04L27/01, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2018/50] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2018/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2018 | Translation filed | 23.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010042887 (YAMADA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraph [0151] *; | [X]WO2016004634 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 60] - [0062]; figures 1, 11 * | International search | [A]JP2007159066 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-8 * , & US 2007/0133701 A1 & CN 1992702 A & TW 200737794 A *; | [A]WO2010100963 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , & JP 2010-206730 A & US 2011/0317599 A1 & US 2016/0294594 A1 & EP 2405677 A1 & EP 2975868 A1 & CN 102334349 A & CN 103997721 A *; | [A]JP2011234412 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-8* , (Family: none) * | Examination | US2015016367 |