EP3468740 - METHOD OF JOINING MATERIALS USING A GRID STRUCTURE ACHIEVED BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/16] | METHODS FOR JOINING MATERIALS, AND MATERIAL COMPOSITE | ||
[2022/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANK, Robin Sundgauer Str. 94 14167 Berlin / DE | 02 /
NÄGEL, Thomas Neufertstr. 8 Vorderhs Etage 1 re 14059 Berlin Charlottenburg-Wilmersdorf / DE | 03 /
REINKENSMEIER, Ingo Hassleistr. 55 58730 Fröndenberg / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17748465.6 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017EP69559 | Priority number, date | DE201610214742 | 09.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016214742 | [2019/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029060 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468740 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3468740 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/19, B23K1/20, B23K15/00, B23K20/00, B23K20/233, B23K20/24, C04B37/02, F01D5/00, B23K26/342, B22F3/105, B23K101/00, B23K103/18 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
B23K1/0018 (EP,US);
B22F10/18 (US);
B22F5/009 (EP,US);
B22F7/062 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
B23K1/19 (EP,US);
B23K1/20 (EP,US);
B23K15/0086 (EP,US);
B23K15/0093 (EP,US);
B23K20/00 (EP,US);
B23K20/233 (EP,US);
B23K20/24 (EP,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,US);
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
F01D5/00 (US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F2301/15 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2103/26 (EP,US);
C04B2237/122 (EP,US);
C04B2237/38 (EP,US);
C04B2237/405 (EP,US);
C04B2237/52 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F7/062, B22F10/28, B22F3/1115, B22F2007/066 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÜGEN VON WERKSTOFFEN DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER MIT EINEM ADDITIVEN VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTEN GITTERSTRUKTUR | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD OF JOINING MATERIALS USING A GRID STRUCTURE ACHIEVED BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MATÉRIAUX UTILISANT UNE STRUCTURE GRILLAGÉE RÉALISÉE PAR FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/16] | VERFAHREN ZUM FÜGEN VON WERKSTOFFEN UND WERKSTOFFVERBUND | ||
Former [2019/16] | METHODS FOR JOINING MATERIALS, AND MATERIAL COMPOSITE | ||
Former [2019/16] | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MATÉRIAUX ET COMPOSITE | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | IE | 02.08.2023 | LU | 02.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 23.11.2022 | |
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59137378 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,9* figure - *; | [Y]JPH0264071 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [Y]JP2010179313 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] , [0036] , [0037]; figure - *; | [Y]DE102011077620 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figure -; claims 1,3,5 *; | [Y]US2013157000 (ROTH-FAGARASEANU DAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0043] , [0062]; figure - *; | [A]US2015322808 (WULF JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0015]; figure - * | by applicant | EP1165941 |