EP3491104 - PRODUCTION OF AROMATICS-RICH HIGHER HYDROCARBONS FROM SOLID BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Kimberly Ann 3026 Jane Long League Drive Richmond Texas 77469 / US | 02 /
KOWALESKI, Ruth Mary 15459 Lakeport Crossing Drive Cypress Texas 77429 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP PO Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17749041.4 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US43860 | Priority number, date | US201662367761P | 28.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662367761 P | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022699 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491104 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10G3/00, C10G1/06, C10G1/08 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
C10G3/49 (EP,US);
B01J29/40 (US);
C07C1/24 (US);
C10G1/065 (EP,US);
C10G1/083 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON AROMATENREICHEN HÖHEREN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS FESTER BIOMASSE | [2019/23] | English: | PRODUCTION OF AROMATICS-RICH HIGHER HYDROCARBONS FROM SOLID BIOMASS | [2019/23] | French: | PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES SUPÉRIEURS RICHES EN COMPOSÉS AROMATIQUES À PARTIR D'UNE BIOMASSE SOLIDE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 28.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/04] | Request for further processing for: | 25.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2014018592 (CHEN XIQIANG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0040] , [0087]; claims 1,6,8; table 2 *; | [Y]US2016186067 (POWELL JOSPEH BROUN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0028] , [0034] , [0081] , [0082] , [0086] , [0101] , [0110] , [0131] , [0137] , [0147] , [0148] , [0158]; figure 1 *; | [A] - Jing Wang ET AL, "Catalytic Performances of Binder-free ZSM-5 Catalysts for Dehydration of Crude Methanol to Dimethyl Ether", Chinese Journal of Chemistry, Shanghai, doi:10.1002/cjoc.201090051, (20100201), pages 183 - 188, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/cjoc.201090051/asset/183_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=j848wofv&s=9fbebc70fe1bda71a18ed6e043fa964b24f592c4, XP055411193 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cjoc.201090051 | [A] - YUEBING XU ET AL, "Comparison of the activities of binder-added and binder-free Mo/HZSM-5 catalysts in methane dehydroaromatization at 1073 K in periodic CH4-H2 switch operation mode", JOURNAL OF NATURAL GAS CHEMISTRY., US, CN, (20121101), vol. 21, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S1003-9953(11)60426-X, ISSN 1003-9953, pages 729 - 744, XP055411195 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1003-9953(11)60426-X | by applicant | US5558851 | US5648585 | US6261534 | US6261545 | US6632415 | US2008300435 | US2010236988 | US2012317872 | US2012317873 | US2013109896 | US2013152457 | US2013152458 | US2014005445 | US2014005444 | US2014117276 | US2014117275 | US2014121419 | US2014117277 | US2014166221 | US2014173975 | US2014174433 | US2014174432 | US8916490 | US8946106 | US2015166681 | US2015167236 | US2015166682 | US2015167241 | US2015167238 | US2015167235 | US2015167240 | US2015167237 | US2015167239 | US2015184081 | - AVELINO CORMA; GEORGE W. HUBER; LAURENT SAUVANAUD; P.O. CONNER, "Processing Bomass-Derived Oxygenates in the Oil Refinery: Catalytic Cracking (FCC) Reaction Pathways and Role of Catalyst", Journal of Catalysis, (20070000), vol. 247, doi:doi:10.1016/J.JCAT.2007.01.023, pages 307 - 327, XP002670517 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JCAT.2007.01.023 | - S. BRUNAUER; P.H. EMMETT; E. TELLER, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19380000), vol. 60, page 308 | - B.C. LIPPENS; J.H. DE BOER, J. Catal., (19650000), vol. 4, page 309 | - E.P. BARRIET; L.G. JOYNER; P.H. HALLENDA, J. Am Chem. Soc., (19510000), vol. 78, page 373 |