Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10249255 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | B2 | US2018240428 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610798537 | 31.08.2016 | WO2017CN76262 | 10.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3507791 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2020 | A4 | EP3507791 | 10.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610798537 | 31.08.2016 | WO2017CN76262 | 10.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018040534 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610798537 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106128402B | Global Dossier | 17.09.2019 | B | CN106128402 | 16.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201610798537 | 31.08.2016 |