EP3507791 - METHOD FOR DRIVING DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Saichang No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17749103.2 | 10.03.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017CN76262 | Priority number, date | CN201610798537 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610798537 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018040534 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507791 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G09G3/3677 (CN,US);
G09G2310/06 (US);
G09G2310/066 (EP);
G09G2310/067 (EP);
G09G2310/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES ANZEIGESUBSTRATS UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DRIVING DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2019/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PILOTAGE DE SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2017 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01219827 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,5-7,9-15* page 154, column 1, line 1 - page 156, column 2, line 12; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5587722 (SUZUKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,12-15 * column 3, line 12 - column 6, line 58; figures 1A-3 *; | [X]US2013321386 (MURAI ATSUHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,12-15 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0242]; figures 1-18 * | International search | [A]CN101191920 (QUNKANG TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010164854 (KIM KYUNG-WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]CN102074180 (RAYDIUM SEMICONDUCTOR CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]CN102968969 (UNIV PEKING SHENZHEN GRAD SCHO, et al) [X] 1, 5-8, 12-14, 17-20 * description, paragraphs 0043-0071, 0095-0097 and figures 5-6, 13 *; | [A]CN105609079 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PX]CN106128402 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 0030-0047 and figure 3 * |