EP3496894 - DEVICE FOR DETACHABLY SECURING MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolibri Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KGaA Albert-Einstein-Ring 22 14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Zeitfracht GmbH & Co. KGaA Friedrich-Olbricht-Damm 46+48 13627 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Sauter Feinmechanik GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 7 72555 Metzingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHANZ, Manfred Rottweilerstrasse 21 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 17749364.0 | 03.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017EP00940 | Priority number, date | DE20161009895 | 13.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016009895 | [2019/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018033235 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3496894 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/00, B23B31/107 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0072 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/1078 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q2220/002 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM WIEDER LÖSBAREN FESTLEGEN VON MODULEN | [2019/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETACHABLY SECURING MODULES | [2019/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION AMOVIBLE DE MODULES | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 13.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4913481 (CHIN LAURENCE D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 3, 6 *; | [XAI]EP0827806 (STARK EMIL JR [AT]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * page 5, line 15 - line 42; figure 1 * [A] 10 [I] 4,5,9,12-14; | [AD]DE10155077 (LANG GUENTER [DE]) [AD] 1-14* figure 3 * | by applicant | DE10155077 | DE102015012938 |