EP3496700 - COMPOSITION FOR EXTERNAL APPLICATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOF Corporation 20-3 Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6019 / JP | For all designated states Chanel Parfums Beauté 135 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKI, Hideyuki c/o K.K.CHANEL RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT LABORATORY 1-1-5 Yamate Funabashi-Shi Chiba 273-0045 / JP | 02 /
KUROMIYA, Tomomi c/o K.K.CHANEL RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT LABORATORY 1-1-5 Yamate Funabashi-Shi Chiba 273-0045 / JP | 03 /
ICHIKAWA, Chikako c/o K.K.CHANEL RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT LABORATORY 1-1-5 Yamate Funabashi-Shi Chiba 273-0045 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Hisao c/o K.K.CHANEL RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT LABORATORY 1-1-5 Yamate Funabashi-Shi Chiba 273-0045 / JP | 05 /
FUKUSHIMA, Mitsuhiro c/o NOF CORPORATION 56 Ohamacho 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | 06 /
MUNEKATA, Yuki c/o NOF CORPORATION 56 Ohamacho 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2019/25] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17749471.3 | 08.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017EP70104 | Priority number, date | JP20160156160 | 09.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016156160 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029209 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496700 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496700 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/896, A61K8/92, A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61K8/58, A61K8/891, A61Q1/02, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/896 (EP,KR);
A61K8/891 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,KR);
A61K8/37 (EP,KR);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR EXTERNEN ANWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/25] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR EXTERNAL APPLICATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR UNE APPLICATION EXTERNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 06.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2017 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | PT | 14.12.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 08.08.2017 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 08.08.2017 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1736138 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-7* paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0012] , [0021] * | by applicant | WO2009010356 | JP4745962B |