13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
18.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
11.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
10.07.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
04.07.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.10.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
02.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
17.05.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
06.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|