EP3493912 - FLOTATION LINE AND A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Finland Oy Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | [2023/43] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states Metso Outotec Finland Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Metso Minerals Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states Outotec (Finland) Oy Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURKE, Peter Gerard 22 Maud Rd. Maida Vale Perth 6057 / AU | 02 /
RINNE, Antti Itätuulenkuja 1 A 14 02100 Espoo / FI | 03 /
COLEMAN, Rob 6 Tandara street The Gap Queensland 4061 / AU | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 17749504.1 | 28.07.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017FI50559 | Priority number, date | WO2016FI50552 | 05.08.2016 Original published format: PCT/FI2016/050552 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018024945 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493912 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/02, B03D1/14 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B03D1/02 (EP,EA,RU,US);
B03D1/1406 (EP,EA,RU,US);
B03D1/1443 (EP,EA,RU,US);
B03D1/1456 (EP,EA,RU,US);
B03D1/1462 (EP,EA,RU,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | FLOTATIONSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN | [2019/24] | English: | FLOTATION LINE AND A METHOD | [2019/24] | French: | LIGNE DE FLOTTAISON ET PROCÉDÉ | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 25.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US1415105 (MOFFAT DAVID D); | [A]US3037626 (SHINYU TAKAHASHI); | [A]US5965857 (HUGHES STEPHEN [AU]); | [A]DE10329883 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP1622724 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]); | [A]WO2007082317 (MINTEK [ZA], et al); | [A]US2008149536 (RONKAINEN SEPPO [FI], et al) |