EP3414373 - COMPOSITE MATERIALS COMPRISING SYNTHETIC DRAGLINE SPIDER SILK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seevix Material Sciences Ltd. Minrav Building Jerusalem Biotechnology Park (JBP) Hadassah Ein Kerem Campus 7630816 Jerusalem / IL | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITTAH, Shmulik 22 Hachazav Street 9071722 Mevaseret Zion / IL | 02 /
SHIMEL, Meni 10 Shaul HaMelech Street 5565418 Kiryat Ono / IL | 03 /
SKLAN, Ella 12 Rabi Tarfon Street 9359210 Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
STERN, Dganit Kibbutz Lavi 1526700 Kibbutz Lavi / IL | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/17] |
Former [2018/51] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17749991.0 | 12.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017IL50175 | Priority number, date | US201662293880P | 11.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662293880 P | US201662317572P | 03.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662317572 P | WO2016IL50874 | 10.08.2016 Original published format: PCT/IL2016/050874 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017138002 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414373 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414373 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, C12N5/00, C12N5/071, D01D5/00, D01F4/00, D01F1/10, D01F6/88 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/43518 (EP,KR,US);
D01F4/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0068 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0602 (EP,US);
D01D5/0038 (EP,KR,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
D01F4/02 (US);
D01F6/88 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2533/30 (EP,US);
C12N2533/50 (EP,US);
D10B2211/01 (US);
D10B2211/04 (US);
D10B2331/00 (US);
D10B2331/02 (US);
D10B2331/041 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | D01F8/02, A61F2/02, C12N1/38, A61K38/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTOFFE MIT KÜNSTLICHER SPINNENSEIDE AUS EINEM ABSEILFADEN | [2018/51] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIALS COMPRISING SYNTHETIC DRAGLINE SPIDER SILK | [2018/51] | French: | MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES COMPRENANT DE LA SOIE D'ARAIGNÉE SYNTHÉTIQUE DE TYPE FIL DE TRAÎNE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 05.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2021 | Observations by third parties | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24163979.8 / EP4375403 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2017025964 (SEEVIX MAT SCIENCES LTD [IL]); | International search | [XY]WO2006002827 (UNIV MUENCHEN TECH [DE], et al); | [Y]US2012022005 (GAT URI [IL], et al); | [PX]US2016298265 (LEWIS RANDOLPH V [US], et al); | by applicant | US8461301 | other | WO2004090205 | WO2011113592 | WO2014037453 | US2015165092 |