EP3414169 - CONTAINER WITH PRESSURE ACCOMMODATION PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pepsico, Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHMEIER, Michael Andrew c/o PepsiCo Inc. 555 West Monroe Street Chicago Illinois 60661 / US | 02 /
WINGFIELD, Toby Richard David c/o PepsiCo Inc. 555 West Monroe Street Chicago Illinois 60661 / US | 03 /
BARTMAN, Lori Evans 4220 Butternut Court Sylvania Ohio 43560 / US | 04 /
GROLL, Robert Jon 340 North Norden Road Oregon Ohio 43560 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17750578.1 | 31.01.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US15798 | Priority number, date | US201615019806 | 09.02.2016 Original published format: US201615019806 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139134 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414169 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/00, B65D1/02, B65D23/00, B65D79/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B65D79/0084 (EP,RU,US);
B65D2501/0036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | B65D1/00, B65D1/02, B65D23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT EINEM DRUCKAUFNAHMEPANEEL | [2018/51] | English: | CONTAINER WITH PRESSURE ACCOMMODATION PANEL | [2018/51] | French: | RÉCIPIENT AVEC PANNEAU D'ADAPTATION DE PRESSION | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE60120446T (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US]); | [XI]US2007187355 (KAMINENI SATYA [US]); | [XI]US2011220668 (STEIH RICHARD J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US6796450 (PREVOT ROGER M [US], et al); | [A]US2006289378 (ZHANG QIUCHEN P [US]); | [A]US2008041811 (STOWITTS ADAM P S [US]); | [A]US2010032405 (OZAWA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [XY]US2011220668 (STEIH RICHARD J [US], et al); | [X]US2012175337 (GILL MATTHEW T [US]); | [Y]US2012261430 (BOUKOBZA MICHEL [FR]); | [A]US2013153531 (SCHLIES ANTHONY J [US], et al) | by applicant | DE60120446T | US2007187355 | US2011220668 |