EP3452342 - FUEL DISTRIBUTION STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capat LLC 3535 Hiawatha Avenue, Suite 304 Miami, FL 33133 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAJIGA, Jose 3535 Hiawatha Avenue, Suite 304 Miami, Florida 33133 / US | 02 /
VILLAR, Arturo 3535 Hiawatha Avenue, Suite 304 Miami, Florida 33133 / US | 03 /
VILLAR, Vicente 3535 Hiawatha Avenue, Suite 304 Miami, Florida 33133 / US | 04 /
CAJIGA, Alexandra 3535 Hiawatha Avenue, Suite 304 Miami, Florida 33133 / US | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17750656.5 | 08.02.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017US16911 | Priority number, date | US201662292978P | 09.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662292978 P | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139312 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452342 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/02, B60S5/04, B67D7/04, B67D7/38, B67D7/40, B67D7/78, E04H1/12, F17C5/00, F17C13/12 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
B60S5/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B67D7/08 (KR,US);
B67D7/04 (EP,KR,US);
B67D7/40 (EP,KR,US);
B67D7/78 (EP,KR,US);
F17C13/12 (EP,US);
F17C5/00 (KR,US);
F17C5/007 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0111 (EP,US);
F17C2205/013 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0134 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | B60S5/02, B67D7/38, B67D7/40, B67D7/78, E04H1/12, F17C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFVERTEILERSTATION | [2019/11] | English: | FUEL DISTRIBUTION STATION | [2019/11] | French: | STATION DE DISTRIBUTION DE CARBURANT | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 22.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/48] | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP20188790.8 / EP3760498 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4901748 (SHOTMEYER ALBERT [US]) [A] 1-8,10-17 * column 2, line 60 - column 8, line 11 ** figures 1-11 *; | [A]US5954102 (SATO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,10-17 * column 3, line 5 - column 7, line 40 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2012177451 (CAJIGA JOSE [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10-17 * page 8, line 18 - page 11, line 11 * * page 17, line 30 - page 19, line 25 * * page 23, line 10 - page 24, line 20 * * page 29, line 10 - page 29, line 25 * * figures 22-25,39-44 * | International search | [A]US2021544 (SHANNON CROWN GEORGE) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US4901748 (SHOTMEYER ALBERT [US]) [Y] 8, 18-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US4986446 (MONTGOMERY JERRY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US5251473 (REESE R ALLAN [US]) [Y] 5, 14, 19, 20 * entire document *; | [Y]US5954102 (SATO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]US6237647 (PONG WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1, 10-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2010023162 (GRESAK KRISTIJAN [SI], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document * | by applicant | WO2012177451 |