Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022346886 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | US201816076409 | 08.08.2018 | US202217851270 | 28.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11399895 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | B2 | US2019038365 | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716076409 | 10.02.2017 | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180104763 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6828047B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2021 | B2 | JP2019504714 | 21.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4375934 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2024 | A3 | EP4375934 | 29.05.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | EP17750840 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114652441 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | CN201780019575 | 10.02.2017 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109069217B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2022 | B | CN109069217 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3413829 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | B1 | EP3413829 | 09.10.2019 | A4 | EP3413829 | 19.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | WO2017US17391 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017139591 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662294845 | 12.02.2016 | US201662294857 | 12.02.2016 | Type | Divisional application |