EP3491266 - TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hasse & Wrede GmbH Georg-Knorr-Strasse 4 12681 Berlin / DE | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEIDL, Michael Georg-Stern-Str. 31 10318 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KNOPF, Florian Kissinger Str. 14 14199 Berlin / DE | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17751278.7 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017EP68530 | Priority number, date | DE201610113719 | 26.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016113719 | [2019/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018019729 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491266 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3491266 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/14, F16F15/167 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
F16F15/167 (EP,US);
F16F15/1442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER | [2019/23] | English: | TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER | [2019/23] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS DE TORSION | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 17.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE4110845 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 6 [I] 4,9; | [XI]US5140868 (MIZUNO NAOHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [I] 4,9; | [A]DE19643687 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XI]DE102006016202 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [I] 4,9; | [A]EP2607744 (HASSE & WREDE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | Examination | DE2353891 | by applicant | GB1105292 |