EP3490510 - INTRAOSSEOUS STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre Hospitalier Universitaire de Bordeaux 12 Rue Dubernat 33404 Talence Cedex / FR | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNELIS, François 85 boulevard George V 33400 Talence / FR | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17751811.5 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017FR52077 | Priority number, date | FR20160057214 | 27.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1657214 | [2019/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018020150 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490510 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3490510 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/82, A61B17/72 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61B17/7097 (EP,US);
A61B17/8855 (EP,US);
A61B17/8858 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAOSSALER STENT | [2019/23] | English: | INTRAOSSEOUS STENT | [2019/23] | French: | STENT INTRA-OSSEUX | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 31.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 26.07.2023 | LU | 26.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 08.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5954724 (DAVIDSON JAMES A [US]) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1a,1b *; | [XY]WO2007144782 (BOUDJEMLINE YOUNES [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 16 * [Y] 2-14; | [XY]US2008051877 (HSIAO HAO-MING [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-14; | [Y]EP2127608 (BIORETEC OY [FI]) [Y] 1-14* figures 26a,26b *; | [Y]US8128626 (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2015112418 (ARGENTINE JEFFERY [US]) [X] 1 * figures 6,9 * [Y] 2-14 | Examination | WO2008076357 | WO2014044209 | WO2016059026 |