EP3484981 - LUBRICATING COMPOSITION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/21] | LUBRICANT COMPOSITION AND USE | ||
[2020/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuchs Petrolub SE Friesenheimer Strasse 17 68169 Mannheim / DE | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOSCH, Achim Ohligstrasse 21 67593 Westhofen / DE | 02 /
FUNDUS, Agnes Schumannstrasse 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | mepat Patentanwälte Dr.Mehl-Mikus, Goy, Dr Drobnik PartGmbB Eisenlohrstraße 31 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17752000.4 | 12.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017EP00824 | Priority number, date | EP20160001544 | 12.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16001544 | [2019/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018010841 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484981 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3484981 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10M105/34 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
C10M141/10 (EP,US);
C10M141/00 (KR);
C10M169/02 (US);
B08B3/08 (US);
C10M115/02 (US);
C10M117/02 (US);
C10M129/10 (US);
C10M129/70 (US);
C10M129/93 (US);
C10M133/04 (US);
C10M133/44 (US);
C10M135/10 (US);
C10M137/12 (US);
C10M2203/003 (US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2203/102 (US);
C10M2203/1065 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2205/16 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/023 (US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/128 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/18 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/22 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/34 (US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/1013 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/26 (US);
C10M2215/30 (US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2223/06 (US);
C10N2020/011 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2020/02 (US);
C10N2020/091 (US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/06 (US);
C10N2030/10 (US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/24 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/245 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/246 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2203/1006, C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104, C10M2209/108 (US,EP);
C10M2219/044, C10N2010/02 (US,EP);
C10M2219/044, C10N2010/04 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTEL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2019/21] | English: | LUBRICATING COMPOSITION AND USE | [2020/34] | French: | COMPOSITION D'AGENT DE LUBRIFICATION ET UTILISATION | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/21] | LUBRICANT COMPOSITION AND USE | ||
Former [2019/21] | COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 23.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2017 | AL | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | IE | 12.07.2021 | LU | 12.07.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2207504 (MOBIL OIL CORP) [Y] 1-12,14,15 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5021172 (KAVNATSKY ZARA M [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,9,10 *; | [AD]US5069806 (TRIVETT ROBERT L [US]) [AD] 1-12,14,15 * claims 1, 2, 3,5 *; | [Y]EP0507449 (CASTROL IND INC [US]) [Y] 13-15* examples 2, 4; claims 1, 6, 7 * | by applicant | DE2207504 | US5069806 |