EP3398091 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL ON FEDERATED DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/45] | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND DEVICE FOR UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL ON FEDERATED DATABASE | ||
[2022/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMMATH, V Vimal Das SYNO 37 46 45/3 45/4 ETC. KNO 1540 Kundalahalli Village Bengaluru Karnataka 560037 / IN | 02 /
THOMAS, Tijo SYNO 37 46 45/3 45/4 ETC. KNO 1540 Kundalahalli Village Bengaluru Karnataka 560037 / IN | 03 /
KRISHNANKUTTY CHANDRIKA, Vinod SYNO 37 46 45/3 45/4 ETC. KNO 1540 Kundalahalli Village Bengaluru Karnataka 560037 / IN | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/45] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17752645.6 | 03.02.2017 | [2018/45] | WO2017CN72859 | Priority number, date | IN201641005870 | 19.02.2016 Original published format: IN201641005870 | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140213 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3398091 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3398091 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/2452, G06F16/2453, G06F16/25, G06F16/00, G06F16/2455 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G06F16/24524 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/24542 (EP,US);
G06F16/24564 (EP,US);
G06F16/256 (EP,US);
G06F21/6227 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VEREINHEITLICHTEN ZUGRIFFSKONTROLLE AUF EINE FÖDERIERTE DATENBANK | [2022/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL ON FEDERATED DATABASE | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS UNIFIÉ SUR UNE BASE DE DONNÉES FÉDÉRÉE | [2022/02] |
Former [2018/45] | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VEREINHEITLICHTEN ZUGRIFFSKONTROLLE AUF EINE FÖDERIERTE DATENBANK | ||
Former [2018/45] | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND DEVICE FOR UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL ON FEDERATED DATABASE | ||
Former [2018/45] | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS UNIFIÉ SUR UNE BASE DE DONNÉES FÉDÉRÉE | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 05.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2021 | 23.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | IT | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | GB | 03.02.2023 | IE | 03.02.2023 | LU | 03.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
GB | 03.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 03.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2013218911 (LI YUE [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013325841 (AHMED TANVIR [US], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [Y]US2015317486 (MULLER LESLIE [GB], et al) [Y] 1-30 * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0030], [0068], [0109] *; | [Y]US2015370897 (LIU HAO [CN], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract and description, paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0042], [0057]-[0062] * | by applicant | US2015317486 | US2015370897 |