Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020268164 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017ES07007 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3417744 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | B1 | EP3417744 | 30.10.2019 | A4 | EP3417744 | 26.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017ES70077 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3417744T | 15.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017ES70077 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2919664T | 27.07.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017ES70077 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3417744T | 14.06.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017ES70077 | 10.02.2017 | EP17752723 | 10.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017140931 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2574355 | 23.03.2017 | B1 | ES2574355 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201630190 | 19.02.2016 |