EP3419281 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIMURA Kouichi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17753005.2 | 06.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017JP04160 | Priority number, date | JP20160029923 | 19.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016029923 | [2018/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017141745 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419281 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/91, G09G5/00, G11B20/12, G11B27/00, G11B27/10, H04N5/76, H04N9/79, H04N9/82, H04N5/85, H04N21/436, // H04N5/775 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/19 (US);
G09G5/005 (EP,US);
G09G5/006 (US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (US);
H04N21/436 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8233 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2018/52] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROGRAMME | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2018 | Translation filed | 13.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 28.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014115472 (MOCHINAGA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11,12 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0201] *[I] 2-6,10; | [X]WO2015008448 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0139] * * figures 2,3,4,5,6 *; | [X]WO2015198553 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0144] *; | [E]EP3163890 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0144] * | International search | [YA]JP2005303977 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-4, 7-12 * , paragraphs [0121] to [0135]; fig. 25 to 28 & US 2005/0111832 A1 paragraphs [0161] to [0175]; fig. 25 to 28 * [A] 5, 6; | [A]WO2014203746 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0141] to [0174]; fig. 15 to 19 & US 2016/0134832 A1 paragraphs [0207] to [0240]; fig. 15 to 19 & US 2016/0269676 A1 & EP 3013040 A1 & AU 2014282416 A & CA 2914978 A1 & CN 105284106 A & KR 10-2016-0022305 A & MX 2015017079 A & TW 201509191 A *; | [YA]JP2015022775 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-4, 7-12 * , paragraphs [0075] to [0112]; fig. 3 to 6 & US 2016/0173846 A1 & WO 2015/008448 A1 paragraphs [0076] to [0113]; fig. 3 to 6 & EP 3022939 A1 & TW 201523575 A & CA 2916577 A1 & CN 105359543 A & KR 10-2016-0032044 A & MX 2016000029 A * [A] 5, 6 |