EP3417869 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING PHRAGMITIS RHIZOMA EXTRACT AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT FOR PREVENTING, AMELIORATING, OR TREATING DISEASE ATTRIBUTED TO SIDE EFFECT OF ANTICANCER AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Oriental Medicine 1672 Yuseong-daero Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34054 / KR | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jinhee 503-1103 33 Banseokdong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34069 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Eun Sang 205-203 14 Singalma-ro 86beon-gil Seo-gu Daejeon 35282 / KR | 03 /
KIM, No Soo 113-801 71 Jeonmin-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34053 / KR | 04 /
BANG, Ok-Sun 103-103 134 Baeul 2-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34033 / KR | 05 /
LEE, You Jin Room 401 103 Singi-ro Dong-gu Daejeon 34679 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Young-Ah A-503 66 Myeongnyun-ro 12-gil Jung-gu Daegu 41965 / KR | 07 /
HUH, Eunna 508-201 103 Gimpohangang 2-ro Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 10089 / KR | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17753532.5 | 17.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017KR01813 | Priority number, date | KR20160019339 | 18.02.2016 Original published format: KR 20160019339 | [2018/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017142371 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417869 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/899, A23L33/105, A61K31/337, A61K45/06, A61P7/06, A61P43/00, A23L2/02, A23L2/52 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K36/899 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/40 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
A61K2236/331 (US);
A61K2236/333 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | A61K36/899, A23L33/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PHRAGMITIS-RHIZOMA-EXTRAKT ALS WIRKSTOFF ZUR VERHINDERUNG, LINDERUNG, ODER BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT NEBENWIRKUNGEN EINES ANTIKREBSMITTELS | [2019/09] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING PHRAGMITIS RHIZOMA EXTRACT AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT FOR PREVENTING, AMELIORATING, OR TREATING DISEASE ATTRIBUTED TO SIDE EFFECT OF ANTICANCER AGENT | [2018/52] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT DE PHRAGMITIS RHIZOMA EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF SERVANT À PRÉVENIR, AMÉLIORER OU TRAITER UNE MALADIE ATTRIBUÉE À UN EFFET SECONDAIRE D'AGENT ANTICANCÉREUX | [2018/52] |
Former [2018/52] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PHRAGMITIS-RHIZOMA-EXTRAKT ALS WIRKSTOFF ZUR VERHINDERUNG, LINDERUNG, ODER BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT NEBENWIRKUNGEN VON EIN ANTIKREBSMITTEL | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2018 | Translation filed | 10.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]KR20110126384 (SUN YUAN LU [TW]) [XD] 9 * pages 2-3; examples Experimental examples 6,7,8; claim 1 * * example Formulation Example 1; claim 2 * [I] 1-8,10; | [XYI]CN103239636 (YUE XIAO) [X] 1,2,9 * pages 1-2; example Test Example 1; claims 1,2,3,5 * [Y] 1,9 [I] 8; | [IAY]WO2010035262 (LIFE BIOTECH MEDICAL RES LTD [IL], et al) [I] 1,3-7,9,10 * pages 4-5,10; claims 1,37,38 * * page 13, lines 1-2; claims 50,53,59-66,70 * * pages 16-17,20; examples 1-3; table 12 * [A] 2,8 [Y] 1,9 | International search | [Y]KR20110126384 (SUN YUAN LU [TW]) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract; claims 1-3; paragraphs [0060]-[0076]. *; | [Y]KR20120121813 (KIM, Tae Keun) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraph [0014]. *; | [A]WO2013048140 (SOLVIT P & F [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *; | [A]WO2011132986 (UNIV CHUNG ANG IND [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20140015199 (HYUNDAI PHARM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. * |