EP3417531 - HIGH TORQUE DENSITY ELECTRIC MOTOR/GENERATOR WITH ROLLING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBIN, Matthew J. 4749 Pennington Court Indianapolis, Indiana 46254 / US | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17753751.1 | 15.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017US17959 | Priority number, date | US201662295259P | 15.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662295259 P | US201762454334P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454334 P | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017142940 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417531 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/06, H02K41/06, B65G13/075, B65G23/08, F16H15/50, F16H25/12 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H02K41/06 (EP,US);
H02K7/12 (KR,US);
H02K41/065 (EP,KR,US);
H02K1/17 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | H02K7/12, B65G13/06, B65G13/075, B65G23/08, F16H15/50, F16H25/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR/GENERATOR MIT WÄLZKÖRPER UND HOHER DREHMOMENTAUSBEUTE | [2018/52] | English: | HIGH TORQUE DENSITY ELECTRIC MOTOR/GENERATOR WITH ROLLING ELEMENT | [2018/52] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR/MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE À HAUTE DENSITÉ DE COUPLE AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT ROULANT | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 07.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 22.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2094066 (ASK JONAS WALDEMAR, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0340749 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [X] 1,11 * abstract *; | [X]DE10309076 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US2008007130 (EDELSON JONATHAN S [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2011072926 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [A] 12* abstract *; | [XI]WO2014046487 (KOREA IND TECH INST [KR]) [X] 1-5,7,9,13-15 * abstract * [I] 8; | [X]US2014184002 (LEVIN SHALOM [IL], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4634950 (KLATT FREDERICK W [US]) [Y] 2, 25, 37 * entire document *; | [Y]US6369477 (BONIN RICHARD L [US]) [Y] 6, 7, 12 * entire document *; | [XY]US6455975 (RAAD BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 11, 20, 22-24, 29 * entire document * [Y] 2, 4-10, 12, 13, 17-19, 21, 25-28, 30, 32-40; | [Y]US6717323 (SOGHOMONIAN ZAREH [US], et al) [Y] 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US7786646 (LU WEITING [TW], et al) [Y] 7, 10, 28 * entire document *; | [Y]CA2576182 (VICTORY RIG EQUIPMENT CORP [CA]) [Y] 35, 36* entire document *; | [Y]US2013337957 (VRANISH JOHN M [US]) [Y] 4, 5, 8, 9, 17, 18, 26, 27, 32, 39 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014184002 (LEVIN SHALOM [IL], et al) [Y] 13, 30, 34-40 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015035405 (LITTLEJOHN MATTHEW HAL [US], et al) [Y] 21, 33 * entire document * |