EP3504164 - FORMATE CATALYSIS FROM HYPERSALINE ENVIRONMENTS BY A HALOTOLERANT HALOMONAS SP. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2020/38] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKROTH, Heike Zum Hahnenberg 30 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
HERWIG, Christoph Jenbachgasse 73/2 1130 Wien / AT | 03 /
KAMRAVAMANESH, Donya Ogugasse 5/2/12 1220 Wien / AT | 04 /
RUSCHITZKA, Paul Schumanngasse 9/20 1080 Wien / AT | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17754383.2 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017EP71334 | Priority number, date | EP20160185666 | 25.08.2016 Original published format: EP 16185666 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018037081 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504164 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/34 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
C02F3/34 (EP,KR,US);
C02F3/348 (US);
C02F1/58 (KR);
C12N1/20 (US);
C25B1/34 (EP,US);
C02F2101/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | FORMIATKATALYSE AUS HYPERSALINEN UMGEBUNGEN MIT HALOTOLERANTEN HALOMONAS SP | [2019/27] | English: | FORMATE CATALYSIS FROM HYPERSALINE ENVIRONMENTS BY A HALOTOLERANT HALOMONAS SP. | [2019/27] | French: | CATALYSE DE FORMIATE D'ENVIRONNEMENTS HYPER-SALINS PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'HALOMONAS SP. HALOTOLÉRANT | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 25.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.04.2023 | 20.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/37] | 08.05.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2009026211 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * abstract *[Y] 1-11,14,15; | [XDYI] - AZACHI ET AL., CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 41, pages 548 - 553, XP008183057 [XD] 1,3-15 * the whole document * * last paragraph * * page 549, 4th paragraph * * page 549 right-hand column * [Y] 1-11,14,15 [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/m95-073 | [XYI] - OREN A ET AL, "Microbial degradation of polluants at high salt concentration", BIODEGRADATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (19920101), vol. 3, doi:10.1007/BF00129095, ISSN 0923-9820, pages 387 - 398, XP002532583 [X] 1,3-15 * abstract * * page 394, second paragraph; section conclusion * [Y] 1-11,14,15 [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00129095 | by applicant | WO2013124375 | - PENDASHTEH; FAKHRU'L RAZI; CHUAH; RADIAH; MADAENI; ZURINA, Environ. Technol., (20100000), vol. 31, pages 1229 - 1239 | - HINTEREGGER; STREICHSBIER, Biotechnol. Lett., (19970000), vol. 19, pages 1099 - 1102 | - MATA MARTINEZ-CANOVAS; QUESADA; BEJAR, Syst. Appl. Microbiol., (20020000), vol. 25, pages 360 - 375 | - WOOLARD; IRVINE, Water Res., (19950000), vol. 29, pages 1159 - 1168 | - AZACHI; HENIS; OREN; GUREVICH; SARIG, Can. J. Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 41, pages 548 - 553 | - AZACHI et al., Can. J. Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 41, pages 548 - 553 | - OREN et al., Biodegradation, (19920000), vol. 3, pages 387 - 398 |