EP3490813 - TYRE TYPE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILCOT, Florian MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
BERTON, Daniel MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Millanvois, Patrick Jacques Jean Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17754412.9 | 27.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017FR52097 | Priority number, date | FR20160057338 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1657338 | [2019/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018020163 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490813 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60C7/10, B60C7/12, B60C7/14 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
B60C17/009 (EP,US);
B60C5/01 (EP);
B60C7/125 (EP,US);
B60C7/14 (EP);
B60C7/146 (EP);
B60C9/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | REIFENARTIGE VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2019/23] | English: | TYRE TYPE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TYPE PNEUMATIQUE POUR VEHICULE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0018592 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-16* page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 2; figures 1-7 *; | [XD]WO2016116490 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [XD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0054] - [0066]; figures 1-7; claims 1-16 *; | [A]WO2016116491 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0051] - [0061]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US4235270 | WO2005007422 | WO2009087291 | WO2016116490 |