EP3488615 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTEGRATING AND DELIVERING OBJECTS OF INTEREST IN VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VID SCALE, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMASWAMY, Kumar 71 Sayre Drive Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Jeffrey Allen 11 Toth Lane Rocky Hill New Jersey 08553 / US | 03 /
RICHARDSON, John 23737 N. Elm Road Lincolnshire Illinois 60069 / US | 04 /
KEROFSKY, Louis 11347 Carmel Creek San Diego California 92130 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Stortorget 17 252 20 Helsingborg / SE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17754512.6 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017US43248 | Priority number, date | US201662365868P | 22.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662365868 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018017936 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488615 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/431, H04N21/44, H04N21/858 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
H04N21/431 (EP,US);
G06V20/46 (US);
H04N21/2353 (US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION UND AUSGABE VON BESTIMMTEN OBJEKTEN IN EINEM VIDEO | [2019/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTEGRATING AND DELIVERING OBJECTS OF INTEREST IN VIDEO | [2019/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'INTÉGRATION ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'OBJETS D'INTÉRÊT DANS UNE VIDÉO | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 22.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1443768 (INTELLOCITY USA INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0024] - [0 38] * * figures 3,8 *; | [A]US2004190779 (SARACHIK KAREN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0038] ** figures 1-13 *; | [Y]EP2426645 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0026] - [0 38] , [0 44] - [0047] - [0 50] , [0 56] , [0085] , [ 107] , [ 118] , [ 131] * * figures 1-16 *; | [Y]US2012195574 (WALLACE BRUCE ALAN [US]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0037] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2013155106 (ROLLESTON ROBERT JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] * * figures 1-15 *; | [Y] - FUMIHISA SHIBATA ET AL, "A View Management Method for Mobile Mixed Reality Systems", ISBN 978-3-905674-06-4, (20080529), pages 1 - 8, VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENTS 2008 : 14TH EUROGRAPHICS SYMPOSIUM ON VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENTS ; EGVE 2008, EINDHOVEN, THE NETHERLANDS ; MAY 29TH-30TH, 2008 ; [EG SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS], EUROGRAPHICS ASS, AIRE-LA-VI, URL: http://www.rm.is.ritsumei.ac.jp/pdf/paper-final2.pdf, (20110801), XP002655108 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * section 3: "View Management" * | by applicant | - "Geodetic Alignment of Aerial Video Frames Video Registration", SHEIKH, Y., The International Series in Video Computing, Springer, (20030000), vol. 5, pages 144 - 179 |