EP3496762 - NEAR-IR LIGHT-CLEAVABLE CONJUGATES AND CONJUGATE PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services National Institues of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNERMANN, Martin, John NCI Center For Cancer Research 376 Boyles St. Room 225D Frederick MD 21702 / US | 02 /
NANI, Roger, Rauhauser NCI Center For Cancer Research 376 Boyles St. Room 218B, Frederick MD 21702 / US | 03 /
GORKA, Alexander, Patrick NCI Center For Cancer Research 376 Boyles St. Room 218B Frederick MD 21702 / US | 04 /
KOBAYASHI, Hisataka NCI Center For Cancer Research Bldg 10 Rm B3B69, 10 Center Dr. Bethesda MD 20892 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | 01 /
SCHNERMANN, Martin, John NCI Center For Cancer Research 376 Boyles St. Room 225D Frederick MD 21702 / US | ||
02 /
NANI, Roger, Rauhauser NCI Center For Cancer Research 376 Boyles St. Room 218B, Frederick MD 21702 / US | |||
03 /
GORKA, Alexander, Patrick NCI Center For Cancer Research 376 Boyles St. Room 218B Frederick MD 21702 / US | |||
04 /
KOBAYASHI, Hisataka NCI Center For Cancer Research Bldg 10 Rm B3B69 10 Center Dr. Bethesda MD 20892 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17754556.3 | 07.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017US45694 | Priority number, date | US201662373666P | 11.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662373666 P | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018031448 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496762 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K41/00, A61K47/68, A61K49/00, A61K47/54, A61P35/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
A61K41/0042 (EP,US);
A61K47/545 (EP,US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/6809 (EP);
A61K47/6829 (EP,US);
A61K47/6845 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61K47/68, A61K49/00, A61K41/00, A61K47/54, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | DURCH NAHINFRAROTLICHT SPALTBARE KONJUGATE UND KONJUGATVORLÄUFER | [2019/25] | English: | NEAR-IR LIGHT-CLEAVABLE CONJUGATES AND CONJUGATE PRECURSORS | [2019/25] | French: | CONJUGUÉS CLIVABLES PAR LA LUMIÈRE DU PROCHE INFRAROUGE ET PRÉCURSEURS DE CONJUGUÉS | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR101494639B ; | [AP]WO2017027721 (US HEALTH [US]); |