EP3487726 - HEADREST FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TESCA France 109 rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERVE, Grégory CERA TSC 109 rue du Faubourg Saint Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
GEORGES, Laurent 11 Petite rue 08190 Roizy / FR | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 63, Boulevard de Ménilmontant 75011 Paris / FR | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17754743.7 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017FR52019 | Priority number, date | FR20160057027 | 22.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1657027 | [2019/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018015691 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487726 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/80 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B60N2/818 (EP);
B60N2/809 (EP);
B60N2/897 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | KOPFSTÜTZE FÜR EINEN KRAFTFAHRZEUGSITZ | [2019/22] | English: | HEADREST FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE SEAT | [2019/22] | French: | APPUI-TÊTE DE SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 12.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2011155926 (LEAR CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7,8,12* the whole document *; | [YA]DE102013216214 (JOHNSON CONTROLS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,12 * the whole document * [A] 6,9-11; | [YA]EP3045347 (GRAMMER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,12 * the whole document * [A] 6,9-11 |