EP3493717 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS, METHOD AND USE OF A CAPSULE FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/24] | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, METHOD, CAPSULE AND KIT OF CAPSULES FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE | ||
[2021/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGINK, Judith Margreet Hanneke c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
RIJSKAMP, Peter c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CORNELISSEN, Marjan c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KOOIJKER, Klaas c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 17754833.6 | 03.08.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017NL50519 | Priority number, date | NL20162017278 | 03.08.2016 Original published format: NL 2017278 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018026278 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493717 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3493717 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/36, A47J31/06, B65D85/804 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
A47J31/0647 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/36 (IL,RU);
A47J31/3633 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/407 (IL,KR,US);
A47J31/4403 (IL,KR);
B65D85/8043 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG EINER KAPSEL ZUR ZUBEREITUNG EINES GETRÄNKS | [2021/44] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, METHOD AND USE OF A CAPSULE FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE | [2021/44] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET USAGE D'UNE CAPSULE POUR PRÉPARER UNE BOISSON | [2021/44] |
Former [2019/24] | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN, KAPSEL UND KIT VON KAPSELN ZUR ZUBEREITUNG EINES GETRÄNKS | ||
Former [2019/24] | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, METHOD, CAPSULE AND KIT OF CAPSULES FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE | ||
Former [2019/24] | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ, CAPSULE ET KIT DE CAPSULES POUR PRÉPARER UNE BOISSON | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 14.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NO | 05.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2014056862 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [Y]WO2015082662 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [Y]WO2015155145 (NESTEC SA [CH]) | by applicant | WO2015004613 |