EP3497418 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING MECHANICAL CONNECTION POINTS IN AN INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 14.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTSCHAT, Arne c/o Fraunhofer-Institut Windenergie und Energiesystemtechnik Am Seedeich 45 27572 Bremerhaven / DE | 02 /
STAMMLER, Matthias Wandsbeker Chaussee 11 22089 Hamburg / DE | [2019/26] |
Former [2019/25] | 01 /
BARTSCHAT, Arne Dragonerstraße 27 30163 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
STAMMLER, Matthias Wandsbeker Chaussee 11 22089 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17755092.8 | 07.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017EP69965 | Priority number, date | DE201610214705 | 08.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016214705 | [2019/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029153 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3497418 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/24, E02D27/42, F16B41/00, G01B11/26, G06T7/00, F03D17/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
G06T7/001 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
G01N21/95 (EP,US);
E02D27/42 (EP);
F05B2260/30 (EP,US);
F05B2270/331 (EP);
F05B2270/8041 (EP);
F05D2270/8041 (US);
F16B2200/95 (EP,US);
F16B37/14 (EP);
G01L5/24 (EP,US);
G01N21/9515 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON MECHANISCHEN VERBINDUNGSSTELLEN EINER ANLAGE | [2019/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR MONITORING MECHANICAL CONNECTION POINTS IN AN INSTALLATION | [2019/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER DES POINTS DE LIAISON MÉCANIQUES D'UNE INSTALLATION | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 28.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE102012003809 (HEUFT SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO2015075068 (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]WO2016011139 (SAVANNAH RIVER NUCLEAR SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) | by applicant | DE3934952 | DE19831372 |