Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10743282 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B2 | US2020107287 | 02.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916657643 | 18.10.2019 | US201615230970 | 08.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3482227 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2020 | B1 | EP3482227 | 15.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615230970 | 08.08.2016 | WO2017US45084 | 02.08.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018031337 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615230970 | 08.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10477505 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2019 | B2 | US2018041982 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615230970 | 08.08.2016 |