EP3662217 - A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A COOLING APPARATUS, AN ASSEMBLING LINE IMPLEMENTING THE SAME, AND A COMPARTMENT OF SAID COOLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENTILE, Marco Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17755440.9 | 04.08.2017 | [2020/24] | WO2017EP69790 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019025003 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662217 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/00, F25D23/06, G05B19/418, G06Q50/04, H04B5/00 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
F25D23/066 (EP,US);
G05B19/41805 (EP,US);
F25D2700/08 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36371 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40111 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40543 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER KÜHLVORRICHTUNG, MONTAGELINIE, DIE DIESE IMPLEMENTIERT, UND EIN ABTEIL DER KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2020/24] | English: | A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A COOLING APPARATUS, AN ASSEMBLING LINE IMPLEMENTING THE SAME, AND A COMPARTMENT OF SAID COOLING APPARATUS | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT, LIGNE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MISE EN UVRE DE CELUI-CI, ET COMPARTIMENT DUDIT APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 04.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0224040 (KILLINGBECK BERNARD R [GB], et al) [X] 17 * page 16, lines 20-23 * * page 18, lines 1-8; figures 1,2b *; | [A]EP1239720 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [A] 8,16 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2005112102 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 8,16 * abstract *; | [I]US2008103622 (HANSES PHILIP C [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006]; figure - *; | [I]FR2964485 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [I] 1,9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010]; figure - *; | [A]DE102012223547 (BSH BOSCH & SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20140078427 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]CN105059854 (SHENYANG HAIER REFRIGERATOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]CN204818695U (HUNAN JINGYI AUTOMATION CO LTD) [X] 1,9,17 * figure - *; | [IY]US2016210485 (PERRY TAMARA E [US]) [I] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0020] - [0031]; figure - * [Y] 8,16 | by applicant | WO2009019268 |