EP3422758 - LOCATION-BASED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A PLURALITY OF ELECTRICAL OR ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beabloo, S.L. C/ Pujades 350 8 A2 08019 Barcelona / ES | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTELL GUARCH, Jaume C/ Pujades 350 8 A2 08019 Barcelona / ES | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17755868.1 | 22.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017ES70094 | Priority number, date | ES20160030204 | 24.02.2016 Original published format: ES 201630204 | [2019/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017144755 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422758 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3422758 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/18, G08C17/02 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H04W16/18 (EP,ES,US);
H04L67/125 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
G08C2201/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | H04W16/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTSBASIERTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON ELEKTRISCHEN ODER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/01] | English: | LOCATION-BASED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A PLURALITY OF ELECTRICAL OR ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2019/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRIQUES OU ÉLECTRONIQUES BASÉE SUR LA LOCALISATION | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2018 | Translation filed | 05.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2017 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | TR | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | GB | 22.02.2022 | IE | 22.02.2022 | LU | 22.02.2022 | ES | 23.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | FR | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 22.02.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.02.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.02.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
GB | 22.02.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO2015032679 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,9,12 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 4 * * page 12, line 10 - line 16 * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 5 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 2 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 18 * * page 17, line 22 - line 25 * * page 19, line 3 - line 6 * * page 20, line 1 - line 16 * * page 21, line 19 - page 22, line 16 * * page 23, line 4 - line 30 * [A] 7,15 [Y] 6 [I] 2-5,8,10,11,13,14; | [YA]US2015369618 (BARNARD CHRIS [US], et al) [Y] 6 * page 5, paragraph 59 - paragraph 64 * * page 9, paragraph 91 - paragraph 92 * * page 16, paragraph 168 *[A] 1-5,7-15 | International search | [XY]US2014375421 (MORRISON JOHN DAVID [AU], et al) [X] 1 - 8, 11 - 14 * , abstract; figures 1, 2; paragraphs [6-10,14, 16, 18, 25, 47-49, 51, 52, 61, 65, 68, 72-81, 89] * [Y] 9, 10, 15; | [Y]US2015296598 (HAID JOSEF [AT], et al) [Y] 9, 10, 15 * , paragraphs [27 - 34, 60, 61]; *; | [A] - JACOB KASTRENAKES, Philips takes on Apple's iBeacon with lights that send deals to your smartphone, (20140217), URL: http://www.theverse.com/2014/2/17/5419090/philips-connected-lighting-system-ibeacon-competitor, XP055540269 [A] 1-15 | [A] - WIKIPEDIA, "iBeacon", WIKIPEDIA, (20160202), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160202055451/https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/IBeacon, XP055412956 [A] 1-15 | [A] - MAURY WRIGHT, GE Lighting and ByteLight demo LEDs and location services at LFI, (20140609), URL: http://www.ledsmagazine.com/articles/2014/06/ge-lichting-and-bytelight-demo-leds-and-location-services-at-lfi.html, XP055540269 [A] 1-15 |