29.10.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
20.11.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.11.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.11.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.11.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
27.07.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
26.04.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
26.04.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
30.11.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
30.11.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.11.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
05.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.08.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
24.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|