EP3421177 - COIL SPRING PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHK Spring Co., Ltd. 3-10, Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Hideki c/o NHK SPRING Co., Ltd. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA, Daisuke c/o NHK SPRING Co., Ltd. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 03 /
MORIYAMA, Senri c/o NHK SPRING Co., Ltd. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 04 /
AKIYAMA, Satoshi c/o NHK SPRING Co., Ltd. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 05 /
KOMAZAKI, Masaya c/o NHK SPRING Co., Ltd. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 06 /
NAGAYASU, Go c/o NHK SPRING Co., Ltd. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2020/26] |
Former [2019/01] | 01 /
OKADA, Hideki c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
YOKOTA, Daisuke c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
03 /
MORIYAMA, Senri c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
04 /
AKIYAMA, Satoshi c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
05 /
KOMAZAKI, Masaya c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
06 /
NAGAYASU, Go c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17756615.5 | 23.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017JP06940 | Priority number, date | JP20160032139 | 23.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016032139 | [2019/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146177 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421177 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421177 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/10, B24C3/24, B24C9/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
B24C1/10 (EP,US);
B24C3/24 (EP,US);
B24C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPULENFEDERVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/01] | English: | COIL SPRING PROCESSING DEVICE | [2019/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT À RESSORT HÉLICOÏDAL | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2018 | Translation filed | 22.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 08.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | GB | 23.02.2021 | IE | 23.02.2021 | LU | 23.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 23.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 23.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 23.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 23.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 23.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 23.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
IE | 23.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 23.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2252434 (DAE WON KANG UP CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1* figure 6 * | International search | [A]JPS56107880 (KOSHUHA NETSUREN KK) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]DE4408643 (KRUPP AG HOESCH KRUPP [DE]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011247276 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015077638 (SINTOKOGIO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & US 2014/0360241 A1 entire text *; | [A]WO2015136737 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & EP 3088131 A1 entire text *; | [PA]WO2016027554 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-7* , entire text & JP 2016-43429 A entire text * | by applicant | JP2002361558 | JP2003117830 | JP2015077638 |