EP3421604 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING L-AMINO ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Kisho c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Masayuki c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
HIURA, Takehiro c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 04 /
MATSUOKA, Nobuaki c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 05 /
CHIKAMORI, Takehiko c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17756623.9 | 24.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017JP07014 | Priority number, date | JP20160033636 | 24.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016033636 | [2019/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146188 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421604 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421604 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/08 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
C12P13/08 (EP,US);
C12N1/005 (EP);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12R2001/15 (EP,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-AMINOSÄURE | [2019/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING L-AMINO ACID | [2019/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ACIDE L-AMINÉ | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | Translation filed | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2017 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6094094 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK) [A] 1-17* Refers to culturing of a lysine- producing strain under irradiation of light (at least 280 nm) *; | [A]US2015337254 (TAKESHITA RYO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * See [0365-0370] *; | [A] - AMJED HUSSAIN ET AL, "Optimization of fermentation medium for L-lysine production by Corynebacterium glutamicum", PAKISTAN JOURNAL OF BOTANY, (2015), vol. 47, pages 345 - 349, XP002793759 [A] 1-17 * See page 345 (Abstract) * | International search | [A]JP2002065287 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-19 * , & US 2002/0025564 A1 & EP 1182261 A1 & EP 2065471 A1 & KR 10-2002-0016544 A & CN 1348009 A & CN 1982465 A *; | [A]JP2003219807 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-19 * , & US 2003/0152633 A1 & US 2009/0017507 A1 & EP 1331220 A2 & CN 1437865 A *; | [A]WO2006038695 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * , & US 2007/0243590 A1 & US 2010/0273221 A1 & US 2012/0149072 A1 & US 2015/0010962 A1 & US 2015/0010963 A1 & US 2015/0259716 A1 & EP 1813677 A1 & EP 2818554 A2 & EP 2818555 A2 & EP 2818556 A2 & CN 101111602 A & KR 10-2007-0061587 A & KR 10-2009-0023513 A *; | [A]JP2012029565 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-19 * , & US 2011/0281311 A1 & WO 2010/061890 A1 & EP 2360263 A1 & CA 2744852 A & CN 102227504 A & RU 2011126198 A *; | [A]JP2013514357 (Colgate-Palmolive Co.) [A] 1-19 * , & US 2012/0296117 A1 & WO 2011/075422 A1 & EP 2513048 A1 & CN 102666481 A *; | [A]JP2013514362 (Colgate-Palmolive Co.) [A] 1-19* , & JP 2015-38096 A & US 2012/0302788 A1 & WO 2011/075472 A1 & EP 2513047 A1 & CN 102652126 A * |