EP3421041 - COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING METABOLISM DISORDERS COMPRISING LEUCONOSTOC MESENTEROIDES-PRODUCING EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noster Inc. 35-3, Minamibiraki Kamiueno-cho Muko-shi, Kyoto 617-0006 / JP | [2021/14] |
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Nitto Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 35-3 Minamibiraki Kamiueno-cho Muko-shi, Kyoto 617-0006 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Ikuo tete Kunitachi 106 52-13 Fujimidai 4-chome Kunitachi-shi Tokyo 186-0003 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Kenji 9-3 Ooginosatohigashi 6-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0248 / JP | 03 /
HISA, Keiko c/o NITTO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 35-3 Minamibiraki Kamiueno-cho Muko-shi Kyoto 617-0006 / JP | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17756647.8 | 24.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017JP07137 | Priority number, date | JP20160032889 | 24.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016032889 | JP20160134997 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016134997 | [2019/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146213 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421041 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/715, A23K10/16, A23K20/163, A23L33/10, A61K35/744, A61P1/16, A61P3/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/08, A61P3/10, A61P43/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A23K10/16 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61K35/744 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELERKRANKUNGEN MIT LEUCONOSTOC-MESENTEROIDES-PRODUZIERENDEN EXOPOLYSACCHARIDEN ALS WIRKSTOFF | [2019/01] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING METABOLISM DISORDERS COMPRISING LEUCONOSTOC MESENTEROIDES-PRODUCING EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2019/01] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR PRÉVENIR OU TRAITER DES TROUBLES DU MÉTABOLISME COMPRENANT UN EXOPOLYSACCHARIDE PRODUCTEUR DE LEUCONOSTOC MESENTEROIDES EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2019/01] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2018 | Translation filed | 04.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0188095 (BIONEER CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-8* page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 37; claims 1,7 *; | [XY]US2014079676 (OLMSTEAD STEPHEN FRANCIS [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 19] , [0 24]; claims 8,9 * [Y] 1-8 | International search | [A]JP2008179595 (NISSHIN PHARMA INC, et al) [A] 1-35 * , claims 1, 7; paragraph [0039] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010200611 (UNIV HIROSHIMA) [A] 1-35* , entire text & US 2011/0311502 A1 entire text & WO 2010/098131 A1 & EP 2402431 A1 & KR 10-2011-0121688 A *; | [Y]JP2012526145 (Tate & Lyle Ingredients France SAS) [Y] 1-19, 28-35 * , paragraphs [0049], [0054], [0068]; examples; figures & US 2010/0284972 A1 paragraphs [0008], [0057] to [0060]; examples; figures & WO 2010/129839 A1 & EP 2427499 A1 & CN 102439048 A & KR 10-2012-0027314 A *; | [XY]WO2015041299 (NITTO PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 20-27 * , claim 1; examples 1, 4; claims 7, 8, 10 & US 2016/0229925 A1 claim 1; examples 1, 4; claims 7, 8, 10 * [Y] 1-19, 28-35; | [Y] - RUSS-MADIEDO, PATRICIA et al., "An overview of the functionality of exopolysaccharides produced by lactic acid bacteria", International Dairy Journal, (20020000), vol. 12, no. 2-3, pages 163 - 171, XP027377901 [Y] 1-19, 28-35 * Tablel * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-6946(01)00160-1 | [Y] - TURNBAUGH, PETER J. et al., "An obesity- associated gut microbiome with increased capacity for energy harvest", Nature, (20061200), vol. 444, no. 7122, pages 1027 - 1031, XP002492885 [Y] 1-19, 28-35 * , page 1027, left column, 3rd paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature05414 | [XPY] - JUNKI MIYAMOTO et al., "Leuconostoc mesenteroides NTM048 ga Sansei suru Kintaigai Tato no Taisha Kaizen Sayo", Journal of Japan Society for Lactic Acid Bacteria, (20160626), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 1343-327X, page 133, XP009512334 [XP] 1-6, 9-17, 20-33 * , column of | [A] - KENJI FUKUDA, "Nyusankin no Saibogai Tato", Bulletin of Applied Glycoscience, (20150000), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.5458/bag.5.1_31, ISSN 2185-6427, pages 31 - 37, XP009512301 [A] 1-35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5458/bag.5.1_31 | [A] - KENJI FUKUDA et al., "Exopolysaccharides from dairy lactic acid bacteria", Bulletin of Japan Dairy Technical Association, (20100000), vol. 60, ISSN 1341-7878, pages 66 - 92, XP009512371 [A] 1-35 |