|
10.08.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
19.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2018 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.09.2018 |
The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
21.08.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
31.08.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
57 |