EP3421039 - DRUG FOR CANCER THERAPY CHARACTERIZED BY ADMINISTERING COMBINATION BETWEEN AXL INHIBITOR AND IMMUNE CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Kohei c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-1 Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
YASUHIRO, Tomoko c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-1 Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17756670.0 | 24.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017JP07219 | Priority number, date | JP20160035206 | 26.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016035206 | [2019/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146236 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421039 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421039 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4709, A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K16/18 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61K45/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/2827 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS DURCH VERABREICHUNG EINER KOMBINATION AUS EINEM AXL-HEMMER UND IMMUN-CHECKPOINT-INHIBITOR | [2019/01] | English: | DRUG FOR CANCER THERAPY CHARACTERIZED BY ADMINISTERING COMBINATION BETWEEN AXL INHIBITOR AND IMMUNE CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR | [2019/01] | French: | MÉDICAMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER CARACTÉRISÉ PAR L'ADMINISTRATION D'UNE ASSOCIATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE L'AXL ET D'UN INHIBITEUR DE POINT DE CONTRÔLE IMMUNITAIRE | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2018 | Translation filed | 21.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 20.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2017 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | IE | 24.02.2022 | LU | 24.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2015012298 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0093] , [0105]; claim 1 * [Y] 1-8; | [P]EP3026045 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0086] , [0098]; claim 1 *; | [YP]WO2016193680 (BERGENBIO AS [NO], et al) [YP] 1-8* claim 1 *; | [Y] - Gausdal, "Abstract B014: BGB324, a selective small molecule inhibitor of the receptor tyrosine kinase AXL, enhances immune checkpoint inhibitor efficacy | Cancer Immunology Research", Cancer Immunol Res 2016;4(1 Suppl):Abstract nr B014., (20160101), URL: http://cancerimmunolres.aacrjournals.org/content/4/1_Supplement/B014, (20181026), XP055519427 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6074.CRICIMTEATIAACR15-B014 | [A] - P. A. OTT ET AL, "CTLA-4 and PD-1/PD-L1 Blockade: New Immunotherapeutic Modalities with Durable Clinical Benefit in Melanoma Patients", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20131001), vol. 19, no. 19, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-13-0143, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 5300 - 5309, XP055458362 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-13-0143 | International search | [Y]WO2015012298 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0085], [0090] to [0093], [0140], [0354] to [0355] & US 2016/0168121 A1 claims; paragraphs [0135], [0140] to [0143], [0202] to [0203], [0714] to [0724] & EP 3026045 A1 & CN 105408312 A & KR 10-2016-0033707 A *; | [Y] - GRO GAUSDAL et al., "Abstract B014: BGB324, a selective small molecule inhibitor of the receptor tyrosine kinase AXL, enhances immune checkpoint inhibitor efficacy", Cancer Immunology Research, vol. 4, no. Suppl 1, (20160100), URL: http://cancerimmunolres.aacrjournals.org/content/4/1_Supplement/B014, (20170322), XP055519427 [Y] 1-9 * , Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6074.CRICIMTEATIAACR15-B014 | [Y] - KUNIKO SUNAMI, "CTLA-4 o Hyoteki to shita Gan Men'eki Ryoho", Japanese Journal of Clinical Medicine (special extra issue) Saishin Gan Yakubutsu Ryohogaku, (20140220), vol. 72, pages 280 - 285 [Y] 1-9 * , Introduction * | [Y] - SHIN FOONG NIGLOW et al., "Anti-TIM3 Antibody Promotes T Cell IFN-y-Mediated Antitumor Immunity and Suppresses Established Tumors", Cancer Research, (20110515), vol. 71, no. 10, pages 3540 - 3551, XP055181433 [Y] 1-9 * , Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0096 | [Y] - PASERO CHRISTINE et al., "Interfering with coinhibitory molecules: BTLA/HVEM as new targets to enhance anti-tumor immunity", Immunology Letters, (20130300), vol. 151, no. 1-2, pages 71 - 75, XP055251710 [Y] 1-9 * , Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.imlet.2013.01.008 | [AP] - YOSHIZAWA TOSHIO et al., "Abstract LB-218: Development of Axl/Mer inhibitor , ONO-9330547: preclinical evidence supporting the combination with immunotherapeutics", Cancer Research, vol. 76, no. 14 S, (20160700), URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/76/14_Supplement/LB-218, (20170322), XP055537320 [AP] 1-9 * , Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2016-LB-218 | by applicant | WO2007030680 | WO2007057399 | WO2007070872 | WO2008045978 | WO2008080134 | WO2008083356 | WO2008083353 | WO2008083354 | WO2008083367 | WO2008083357 | WO2008128072 | WO2009007390 | WO2009024825 | WO2009047514 | WO2009053737 | WO2009054864 | WO2009127417 | WO2010005876 | WO2010005879 | WO2010090764 | WO2010128659 | WO2012028332 | WO2012135800 | WO2013074633 | WO2013115280 | WO2013162061 | WO2014091265 | WO2015012298 | WO2016006706 | WO2016097918 | WO2016193680 | - Clinical Science, (20120000), vol. 122, pages 361 - 368 | - Proceedings of the national academy of sciences of the United States of America, (20100000), vol. 107, no. 3, pages 1124 - 1129 | - Blood, (20130000), vol. 121, pages 2064 - 2073 | - Nature Reviews Cancer, (20140000), vol. 14, pages 769 - 785 | - "Development of Medicaments", Molecular Design, Hirokawa Shoten, (19900000), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - Nature Reviews Cancer, vol. 12, pages 252 - 264,2012 | - Cancer Cell, (20150000), vol. 27, pages 450 - 461 |