EP3421589 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING EFFICACY OF STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University - Industry Cooperation Group of Kyung Hee University 1732 Deogyeong-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17104 / KR | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Ki-Sook 611-802 101 Jagok-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06374 / KR | 02 /
YU, Jinyeong 609 18 Imun-ro Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 02446 / KR | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17756806.0 | 22.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017KR01960 | Priority number, date | KR20160021374 | 23.02.2016 Original published format: KR 20160021374 | [2019/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146468 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421589 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0775, C12N5/0789, A61K35/28, A61K31/19, A61P37/06, A61P29/00 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A61K35/28 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0662 (KR);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (US);
C12N5/0647 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | C12N5/0775, C12N5/0789, A61K35/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER EFFIZIENZ VON STAMMZELLEN | [2019/01] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING EFFICACY OF STEM CELLS | [2019/01] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER L'EFFICACITÉ DE CELLULES SOUCHES | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | Translation filed | 24.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 20.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011067465 (RAJALA KRISTIINA [FI], et al); | International search | [A]US2007043114 (TATEISHI NARITO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * See claims 21-22 and 26-29. *; | [A]US2010010087 (HONG JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-13* See claims 1 and 7. *; | [A]WO2014138888 (STEMCELL TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [A] 1-13 * See claims 1-2, 20 and 30-31. *; | [X] - SMITH, ANDRIA N. et al., "Unsaturated Fatty Acids Induce Mesenchymal Stem Cells to Increase Secretion of Angiogenic Mediators", Journal of Cellular Physiology, (20120000), vol. 227, pages 3225 - 3233, XP055413207 [X] 1-13 * See abstract; page 3226, left column, Cell culture section; page 3229, left column, Unsaturated fatty acids affect MSC chemotaxis section; page 3230, right column, Discussion section; figure 6. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.24013 | [A] - FILLMORE, NATASHA et al., "Effect of Fatty Acids on Human Bone Marrow Mesenchymal Stem Cell Energy Metabolism and Survival", Plos One, (20150313), vol. 10, page e0120257, XP055413208 [A] 1-13 * (pages 1-17) See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0120257 |